DE SB99 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill re-organizes Section 351 to be more reader friendly as to the requirements and exceptions for DSCYF to evaluate homes where children are placed with non-relatives. It also changes the current statute which required DSCYF consent before a child could be placed with a non-relative. This bill would now make the DSCYF position on the placement merely an assessment for consideration by the Family Court. Section (d) makes it clear that the Family Court has the final authority to determine whether or not the placement is appropriate. Finally, this bill modifies the definition of “dependency or dependent child” in 901(8) and 1009(3) in accordance with the proposed changes to Section 351.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 And Title 31 Pertaining To Placement Of Dependent Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate |