DE SB97 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


This bill allows Delaware Department of Transportation authorized vehicles to be able to use the shoulder of the road when responding to emergencies. Department of Transportation staff must respond to emergencies along the road to assist police, fire and paramedics with establishing maintenance of traffic. By allowing the use of the shoulder of the road staff will be able to respond in a timely manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Rules Of The Road.


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]


2017-09-21 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-06-16 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2017-06-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Amendment SA 2 to SB 97 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-06-15 Amendment SA 1 to SB 97 - Stricken in Senate
2017-06-14 Amendment SA 2 to SB 97 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-14 Amendment SA 1 to SB 97 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments