DE SB96 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

In January of 2015, the Office of Civil Rights & Public Trust was created by the Attorney General to establish a centralized office within the Department of Justice for the investigation of matters concerning civil rights enforcement and the prosecution of matters concerning violations of the public trust. This office must remain an independent entity within the Department of Justice to avoid conflicts with other Department of Justice duties and thus effectively enforce laws protecting the public trust and civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Department Of Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-29 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2020-01-23 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2020-01-22 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-22 Amendment SA 1 to SB 96 - Stricken in Senate
2019-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-05-14 Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback