DE SB95 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Amendment SA 2 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill establishes a 20 year retirement for correction officers and specified peace officers within the State Employees Pension plan. The bill amends the multiplier prospectively for the calculation of pension benefits for correction officers and specified peace officers. For service prior to January 1, 2018 the multipliers of either 1.85%, 2.0% or 2.45% would continue to be in effect and then for years of service after January 1, 2018 a uniform multiplier of 2.5% for the first 20 years, plus 3.5% for years beyond 20 years. In addition, this bill amends the employee contribution for all correction officers and specified peace officers to a uniform 7%.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees Pension Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24 Amendment SA 2 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-08 Amendment SA 1 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-01 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback