DE SB95 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Amendment SA 2 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Amendment SA 2 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes a 20 year retirement for correction officers and specified peace officers within the State Employees Pension plan. The bill amends the multiplier prospectively for the calculation of pension benefits for correction officers and specified peace officers. For service prior to January 1, 2018 the multipliers of either 1.85%, 2.0% or 2.45% would continue to be in effect and then for years of service after January 1, 2018 a uniform multiplier of 2.5% for the first 20 years, plus 3.5% for years beyond 20 years. In addition, this bill amends the employee contribution for all correction officers and specified peace officers to a uniform 7%.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Employees Pension Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-08 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 95 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |