DE SB92 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Delaware is one of only 3 states that does not offer some form of adult dental coverage through Medicaid (alongside Tennessee and Alabama).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Dental Care For Adult Medicaid Recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-07 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-20 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 92 |