DE SB92 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill reduces the fee for an initial security freeze from twenty dollars to ten dollars, and from twenty dollars to five dollars for senior citizens. This bill also adds agencies and organizations exempted from placing a security freeze.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Clean Credit And Identity Theft Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Venables [D] | Rep. Andria Bennett [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Rep. Harvey Kenton [R] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-25 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |