DE SB91 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates a requirement that lodging establishments with an appliance that emits carbon monoxide or an attached garage have working carbon monoxide detection devices in each dwelling or sleeping unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Carbon Monoxide Detection Devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23 Signed by Governor
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-28 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2018-05-02 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-05-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2018-05-01 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 91

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback