DE SB90 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill would allow for a student to participate in the Inspire Scholarship Program for eight continuous semesters instead of the current six. This would allow a student to use Inspire Scholarships for each of the semesters during a traditional college program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Inspire Scholarship Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Signed by Governor
2018-04-19 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-04-17 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-03-13 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-03-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-22 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback