DE SB89 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In May 2014, the Department of Health and Social Services (“Department”) promulgated the State of Delaware Food Code, 4458, Title 16 of the Delaware Administrative Code. The State of Delaware Food Code requires all food establishments required to be permitted by the Department to have a certified food protection manager. This Act would require the Department to exempt charitable and fraternal organizations from this requirement. At least 7 other states have created a similar exemption; those states are: Florida, Indiana, Minnesota, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Texas, and Utah.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Certified Food Protection Manager Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2015-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |