DE SB88 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1. Section 1 of this Act amends Section 108(b) to clarify that notice of an initial organization meeting may be given in writing or by electronic transmission. The amendments also eliminate the express requirement that a waiver of that notice be signed, to clarify that notice may be waived in any manner permitted by Section 229. Section 108(c) is being amended to clarify that a consent of incorporator may become effective in the future in the same manner that a consent of directors may become effective in the future under Section 141(f).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 8 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The General Corporation Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-05 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2019-06-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate |