DE SB88 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act authorizes the Division of Parks and Recreation to augment the funding it receives from the State Budget thru proactive endeavors.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Division Of Parks And Recreation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |