DE SB86 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a result of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committees (JLOSC) 2019 review of the Delaware Advisory Council on Career and Technical Education (DACCTE), and adds a requirement to DACCTEs annual report to provide students and families access to information regarding educational, employment, and training opportunities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Advisory Council On Career And Technical Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-03 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-21 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2021-04-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-31 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |