DE SB86 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter of Rehoboth Beach to give the Commissioners the authority to impose and collect a lodging tax.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of Rehoboth Beach Relating To The Power To Impose And Collect A Lodging Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-30 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |