DE SB85 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act draws attention to the types of discipline used in schools by capturing data about out-of-school suspensions and publishing that data, in an effort to help schools identify areas where the data regarding out-of-school suspensions indicates there is room to reduce such suspensions. This Act is meant to increase transparency, improve overall school climate, resulting in improved student outcomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Lawful Authority Of Teachers Over Pupils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11 Signed by Governor
2018-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-06-05 Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 16 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-06-05 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-30 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2018-04-12 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-03-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-03-29 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 85

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback