DE SB85 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act draws attention to the types of discipline used in schools by capturing data about out-of-school suspensions and publishing that data, in an effort to help schools identify areas where the data regarding out-of-school suspensions indicates there is room to reduce such suspensions. This Act is meant to increase transparency, improve overall school climate, resulting in improved student outcomes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Lawful Authority Of Teachers Over Pupils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-05 | Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 16 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-05 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-05-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-12 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2018-03-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-29 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 85 |