DE SB85 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |