DE SB84 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the Delaware Native Species Commission by doing the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Native Species Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Rep. Sean Lynn [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Bryant Richardson [R] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-06 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2019-06-05 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 84 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-06-05 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 84 - Stricken in Senate | |
2019-06-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-29 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 84 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-07 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |