DE SB82 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends the Milford City Charter. The changes are comprehensive in nature and designed to amend and revise many of the outdated provisions dating back to the Act reincorporating the City of Milford in 1970. Many of the changes are technical in nature, including updated terminology and re-organization. There are substantive changes to certain procedures including annexation, tax collection, voting, and vacancies. Some provisions are being removed due to their current inapplicability, such as those relating to the City Alderman. There are also changes updating the powers and authority of city officials along with new provisions relating to ethics and the code of conduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Milford.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-30 Signed by Governor
2017-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2017-06-09 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-08 Amendment SA 2 to SB 82 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-08 Amendment SA 1 to SB 82 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-07 Amendment SA 2 to SB 82 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-06-07 Amendment SA 1 to SB 82 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-12 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback