DE SB81 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits an individual to practice dentistry for the Division of Public Health (Division) under a provisional license. Delaware law provides several routes for entering practice on an interim basis until full licensure can be obtained, however, none of these routes specifically permit hiring by the Division with the intent to practice in a state-supported dental clinic. This Act will assist the Division in recruiting dentists to serve those in need.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To License To Practice Dentistry.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] |
Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-07 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |