DE SB81 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of this bill updates the Delaware Code relating to the Delaware Board of Architects regarding the required practical training in architectural work that each new applicant must acquire prior to being qualified for licensure. The proposed change eliminates confusing language relating to whether the National Council of Architecture Regulatory Boards Intern Development Program is required and authorizes the Board to determine what type of training should be completed and the length thereof in order to be eligible for licensure in Delaware. Section 2 of this bill updates the Delaware Code relating to the Delaware Board of Architects regarding the requirement of new applicants to successfully complete an examination adopted by the Board. The current language of the statute does not specify when an applicant may take the examination or implies that an applicant must wait until completion of the three years of practical training. The proposed change proposes to clarify the statute to allow applicants to take the examination prior to completion of the practical training. Section 3 of this bill proposes to change the requirements of reciprocity applicants to be more in line with other Title 24 Boards. Currently, architecture reciprocity applicants must either meet all of the qualifications for licensure of a new applicant or hold an NCARB certificate; the law does not take into account an applicant’s prior regulated practice in another jurisdiction. The bill allows for licensure of reciprocity applicants who have a license in good standing in another state or jurisdiction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Architects.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Rep. Joseph Miro [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-01-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-05-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |