DE SB80 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act adds a provision addressing the assignability of rights under property insurance policies and authorizes a property insurance carrier to limit a policys assignability only to those persons or entities that have the legal authority to represent an insured.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Assignability Of Insurance Contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2021-03-31 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-24 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-03-04 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback