DE SB80 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act replicates and extends to electric and natural gas utilities the same authority that has previously been granted to water utilities. This authority allows for the implementation of an interim rate mechanism already in existence for water utilities in an effort to reduce volatility and the costs to electric and natural gas customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Signed by Governor
2018-06-07 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO
2018-06-07 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in House
2018-05-30 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-09 Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-05-08 Assigned to Energy Committee in House
2018-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-03 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-03 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-04-26 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-04-19 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-16 Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 80, and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback