DE SB79 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes the timeframe within which a property insurer must give prior written notice of its intent to cancel a policy.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Property Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
Sen. Spiros Mantzavinos [D] | Rep. William Bush [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] |
Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-04-01 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2021-03-31 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-24 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |