DE SB79 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Amendment HA 1 to SB 79 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies existing law so that an individual is not disqualified from possessing or purchasing a firearm because the individual is a registered qualifying patient under the Delaware Medical Marijuana Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 And Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Eligibility Of Registered Qualifying Patients Under The Delaware Medical Marijuana Act To Purchase Or Possess Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30 Amendment HA 1 to SB 79 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2020-01-29 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2019-12-12 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2019-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-06-30 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2019-05-07 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback