DE SB79 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends Section 4111 of Title 14 of the Delaware Code to establish policies and procedures that enable school districts, schools, teachers, and school staff to collect and use student data for appropriate educational purposes while ensuring that the student data is kept safe and the privacy of students and their parents and guardians is protected. The bill provides that the Department of Education shall be responsible developing policies and procedures relating to the privacy and protection of student data in accordance with the act, and shall be responsible for ensuring compliance with the act’s provisions and with other state and federal data privacy and security laws by the Department, school districts, and schools, including by undertaking certain specified activities. The bill also establishes the duties and responsibilities of operators of Internet services used for school purposes with respect to student data they collect, including student personally identifiable information. Further, the bill recognizes the right of parents and eligible students to review and obtain copies of their children’s or their own education records and to request the correction of information in the education records which is incorrect or false. Finally, the bill provides that its provisions will become effective on August 1 the year following its enactment into law, and that its provisions do not apply to projects relating to the privacy and security of student data approved under the Department of Education’s existing education record privacy regulation prior to the effective date of the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educational Data Governance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SS 1 FOR SB 79 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 79 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 4 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 79 - Lifted From Table in Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 79 - Laid On Table in Senate |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 79 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |