DE SB78 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Senate Bill No. 78 enhances the qualifications for an individual to serve as a member of a school board or the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Qualifications For Members Of School Boards And The State Board Of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Signed by Governor
2021-06-24 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2021-06-09 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 3 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
2021-05-14 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2021-05-13 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2021-05-13 Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO
2021-05-13 Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-04-27 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 78

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback