DE SB74 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill makes modification to the New Economy Jobs Credit allowing qualified employers to pro-rate their job creation activity in the first certified year, ensuring the indexation of the salary threshold is conducted prior to the calendar year to assist with business planning and establishing an incentive to qualified employers to maintain their employment thresholds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30, Chapter 20 Of The Delaware Code Relating To New Economy Jobs Program Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2019-05-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-04-16 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback