DE SB74 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act fulfills recommendations made by the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee. First, this Act adds language to establish the circumstances under which Trustees of the Delaware Agricultural Lands Preservation Foundation may be removed, using language standard to boards and commissions in this State. Second, this Act limits review of a preservation easement after 25 years of the easement's acquisition to only easements that were acquired before the enactment of this Act. Preservation easements acquired after the enactment of this Act are not subject to termination under ยง 917 of Title 3. Third, this Act corrects an internal reference, and makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Agricultural Lands Preservation Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 74 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-20 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 74 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |