DE SB73 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Daylight saving time has existed in one form or another for over 100 years. In that time, Delawareans have become accustomed to the 8 months of daylight saving time each year. This Act provides for Delaware to permanently remain on daylight saving time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 1 And Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Standard Time For This State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2019-07-01 Suspension of Rules in House
2019-06-13 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2019-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 NO
2019-06-12 Amendment SA 1 to SB 73 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-11 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-15 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback