DE SB73 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides clearer language concerning license requirements, gives licensees a much clearer understanding of prohibited acts, discipline and penalties; and grants the ability of the Professional Licensing Section to promulgate regulations, and additional powers needed to oversee this chapter.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pawnbrokers, Secondhand Dealers And Scrap Metal Processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2017-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2017-05-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-27 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |