DE SB72 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill continues the practice of amending periodically the Delaware Limited Liability Company Act (the "Act") to keep it current and to maintain its national preeminence. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 18, Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Limited Liability Companies And The Registration And Regulation Of Foreign Limited Liability Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-07 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2017-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2017-06-06 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 72 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-06 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2017-06-06 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2017-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |