DE SB7 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This substitute bill incorporates the provisions of Senate Amendment 2 to the original bill, including reiterating in the Whereas statements the existing law that requires persons arrested for a violent felony while out on bail awaiting trial for a previous violent felony to be held without bail. It also updates the language regarding the courts' obligation to review bail to reflect current practice and requires reporting on such cases and racial impact by the Criminal Justice Council in its annual report. Finally, it provides a sunset provision so that the bill expires when the constitutional amendment regarding bail is enacted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Bail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
2021-06-24 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 5 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 5 to SS 1 - Stricken in House
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 3 to SS 1 - Stricken in House
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Stricken in House
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in House
2021-06-24 Passed By House. Votes: 32 YES 8 NO 1 ABSENT
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 6 to SS 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 8 YES 32 NO 1 ABSENT
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 4 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2021-06-24 Amendment HA 4 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-23 Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-23 Amendment HA 3 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-22 Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-15 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2021-06-11 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2021-06-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO
2021-06-10 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2021-06-10 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2021-06-10 Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-09 Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-06-09 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2021-06-09 was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 7

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback