DE SB7 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Since 1975, the Delaware Population Consortium has prepared a unified set of statewide population projections each year. These projections are used for a variety of purposes including capital planning, policy analysis, comprehensive planning, and transportation planning. All 3 counties are required by State law to utilize these projections to prepare their required comprehensive plans. However, the Delaware Population Consortium does not exist in State law. This Act formally creates the Delaware Population Consortium, identifies its membership and work products, and requires that all counties, municipalities, school districts, and State agencies use the Consortiums projections for planning and policy purposes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Population Consortium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-06 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2019-03-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-05 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 7 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2019-03-05 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2019-03-05 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2019-01-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |