DE SB7 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Amendment SA 1 to SB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act provides county and municipal police and firefighters with the same pension burial benefit that is provided to state employees effective July 1, 2016. This Act is named for Wilmington Firefighters Captain Christopher M. Leach, Lieutenant Jerry W. Fickes, and Lieutenant Ardythe D. Hope, who lost their lives fighting a house fire on September 24, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware County And Municipal Police/firefighter Pension Plan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback