DE SB7 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act provides county and municipal police and firefighters with the same pension burial benefit that is provided to state employees effective July 1, 2016. This Act is named for Wilmington Firefighters Captain Christopher M. Leach, Lieutenant Jerry W. Fickes, and Lieutenant Ardythe D. Hope, who lost their lives fighting a house fire on September 24, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware County And Municipal Police/firefighter Pension Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29 Signed by Governor
2018-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-30 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to SB 7 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-06-07 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
2018-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-04-18 Amendment SA 1 to SB 7 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-22 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback