DE SB67 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
Pending: House Health & Human Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act reinstates the requirement that the Clerks of the Peace in each county maintain a registry of clergypersons or ministers who perform marriages in Delaware. Clergypersons or ministers of any religion desiring to perform wedding ceremonies must register with the Clerk of the Peace. Upon registering, he or she will receive an identification number that he or she must enter on the Certificate of Marriage for each wedding ceremony he or she performs. If the clergyperson or minister registers with the Clerk of the Peace in one county, he or she will be added to a statewide registry and will be able to perform weddings statewide. If a clergyperson or minister performs a wedding without being registered, the Clerk of the Peace can suspend or revoke that clergyperson or ministers ability to perform further weddings in Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Marriages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2019-05-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2019-04-10 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback