DE SB67 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act serves to permit those incumbents occupying upper-level management positions in the Justice of the Peace Court to elect to remain in classified service or move to exempt service. This change ensures that incumbent management employees have the choice of exempt status, which, in some instances, will be offered to their newly-hired subordinates. This option ensures equity among all Justice of the Peace Court upper-level management personnel.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 71, Volume 79 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Certain Positions In The Justice Of The Peace Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |