DE SB66 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act exempts an individual from having to pay the revoked license or driving privileges reinstatement fee if the individual is eligible for and applies for reinstatement of the individuals license or driving privileges within 1 year of their release from Department of Correction Level V supervision. The purpose of this Act is to limit financial barriers that may impede an individual from successfully reintegrating into the community after that individual has served their time. The ability to legally drive is imperative for an individual to secure and maintain employment, access educational opportunities, and foster family and community connection that may lower recidivism. Additionally, if an individual was incarcerated, the individual likely could not renew their license or driving privileges before the license or privilege lapsed. This Act makes it easier for an individual reintegrating to restore their license or driving privileges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Revoked License Or Driving Privileges Fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-03-26 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-03-23 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-03-17 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2021-03-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-03-10 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 Favorable
2021-02-26 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback