DE SB65 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act intends to consolidate the Clean Water Advisory Council for the Delaware Water Pollution Control Revolving Loan Fund and the advisory activities of the Cabinet Committee on State Planning for the Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund into the Water Infrastructure Advisory Council (the “Council”) and to reconfigure the membership of the Council to add Public Health expertise.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code To Rename The Clean Water Advisory Council To The Water Infrastructure Advisory Council And To Reconfigure The Membership Of The Council And Modify Its Responsibilities To Include The Interests Of The Drinking Water Revolving Loan Fund As Well As The Delaware Water Pollution Revolving Loan Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |