DE SB65 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act expands the definition of “nuisance” to include illegal gun crimes, criminal gang activity, recurring violent activity and other public nuisances that cause a tangible injury to the surrounding properties and businesses. The Act streamlines and clarifies the procedures, parties and proof requirements within the statute. The Act provides better guidance for the Court to determine whether the health safety or welfare of the community requires an immediate closure of the nuisance property and allows the owner of a property so closed to petition the Court for an expedited schedule for permanent hearing without posting a bond. Finally, the Act changes the civil penalties associated with a nuisance property from the fair market value to a per diem amount to better address the damage inflicted on the community.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Nuisance Abatement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2011-06-30 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-29 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2011-06-22 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2011-06-01 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2011-05-05 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |