DE SB63 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill updates the criteria for agriculture, horticulture, or forestry land use.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Farms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-04-04 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-03-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |
2023-03-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 63 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 1 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-17 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House | |
2023-03-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-03-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-10 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2023-03-10 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2023-03-09 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |