DE SB63 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
At the recommendation of the Joint Sunset Committee, this Act removes the Council on Manufactured Housing and the Delaware Manufactured Housing Alternative Dispute Resolution Act from the Delaware Code. Author: Sen. Poore
Title
An Act To Amend Title 25 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Manufactured Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 2 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |