DE SB62 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Assigned to Education Committee in House
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill aligns requirements for initial licensure for school nurses to the unique role they play in Delaware public schools. It requires school nurses to hold a Bachelors Degree in Nursing (BSN) from an accredited college or university, maintain a registered nurse license, and be certified in CPR and in the use of an AED. It also requires school nurses to complete 90 clock hours of training approved by the Department of Education. And finally it requires schools nurses to complete three years of supervised clinical nursing experience and achieve a passing score on the NCLEX exam before a provisional or initial license can be granted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure, Certification, And Preparation Programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2017-05-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Amendment SA 4 to SB 62 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Amendment SA 4 to SB 62 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-16 Amendment SA 3 to SB 62 - Sticken in Senate
2017-05-16 Amendment SA 2 to SB 62 - Sticken in Senate
2017-05-16 Amendment SA 1 to SB 62 - Sticken in Senate
2017-05-12 Amendment SA 3 to SB 62 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-12 Amendment SA 2 to SB 62 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Amendment SA 1 to SB 62 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback