DE SB62 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates the minimum insurance coverage requirements for school transportation to reflect current industry standards.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Transportation Of Pupils.
Sponsors
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |