DE SB61 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

State economic development officials pursue economic development opportunities that, if realized, would have significant impact on Delaware's future economic health and competitiveness. Such situations frequently require expeditious action and the need to enhance Delaware's transportation infrastructure on a timeline and schedule that is outside the 6 year Capital Transportation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Department Of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-11 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2019-06-11 Amendment HA 1 to SB 61 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-06-05 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2019-05-30 Amendment HA 1 to SB 61 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-05-16 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2019-05-15 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2019-05-02 Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2019-04-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-10 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2019-04-03 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback