DE SB59 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises the appointment process for members of the Primary Care Reform Collaborative who are not members by virtue of position. Under this Act, these members are appointed by a government official to comply with the requirements of the Delaware Constitution. This Substitute differs from SB 59 by designating the President Pro Tempore of the Senate as the appointing authority for a self-insured employer, per the request by the Delaware Department of Insurance not to serve in that role.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Membership Of The Primary Care Reform Collaborative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-12 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2021-03-11 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-03-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-02-26 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 59, and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |