DE SB57 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act places a duty on the drivers of motor vehicles to clean ice and snow off of their vehicles prior to driving on the States highways. Greater penalties are provided for ice or snow dislodging from a moving vehicle and causing physical injury or property damage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Ice And Snow On Certain Exposed Surfaces Of A Moving Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2017-06-08 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2017-06-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-05-04 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback