DE SB56 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act codifies the Opportunity Fund, an additional source of educational funding for Delaware public schools intended to support the increased needs of low income and English learner students, and establishes the parameters for how the funding is to be distributed to school districts and charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Delaware Code Relating To Educational Opportunity Funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2021-03-12 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2021-03-11 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
2021-03-10 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-01-28 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback