DE SB56 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
Pending: House Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act modernizes the process and requirements for issuance of liquor licenses for off premises consumption. The current process and requirements do not consider population growth. Minimum distance requirements are enhanced while increases in population growth will now be considered to arrive at a safety and convenience balance. This Act also grandfathers existing licensees into the current process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Alcoholic Liquors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17 Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
2019-04-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 8 NO 1 ABSENT
2019-04-10 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2019-03-20 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback